DIRECTOR :
LALY THOLATH KOCHUKUNJAN
As On :
Sunday, 22 September 2024
Total Page Views : 3 Name | LALY THOLATH KOCHUKUNJAN |
Total Companies | 12 |
First Appointment Date | Saturday, 30 April 2011 |
Last Resigned Date | |
Social Links | |
LALY THOLATH KOCHUKUNJAN was appointed on Saturday, 30 April 2011 with HANNA ROCK PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 13 Year(s), 4 month(s), 22 day(s), and also appointed on Wednesday, 22 May 2013 with AURAL HOTELS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 11 Year(s), 4 month(s), 0 day(s), and also appointed on Thursday, 20 August 2015 with DURASAND GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 9 Year(s), 1 month(s), 2 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 19 February 2016 with RICHSAND CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 8 Year(s), 7 month(s), 3 day(s), and also appointed on Tuesday, 27 November 2018 with PAUL AND HANNA BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 5 Year(s), 9 month(s), 25 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 04 February 2019 with DURABUILT CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 5 Year(s), 7 month(s), 18 day(s), and also appointed on Tuesday, 20 August 2019 with CHATTUPARA GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 5 Year(s), 1 month(s), 2 day(s), and also appointed on Friday, 31 July 2020 with HIGRADE CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 4 Year(s), 1 month(s), 22 day(s), and also appointed on Thursday, 29 October 2020 with MANNATHUR GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 3 Year(s), 10 month(s), 24 day(s), and also appointed on Monday, 24 May 2021 with LALY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 3 Year(s), 3 month(s), 29 day(s), and also appointed on Thursday, 07 October 2021 with VAZHAPILLY GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 2 Year(s), 11 month(s), 15 day(s), and also appointed on Thursday, 07 October 2021 with CHITTOOR BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED - ERNAKULAM - Total Tenure of 2 Year(s), 11 month(s), 15 day(s)
Rank | Logo | CIN | Company Name | City | Appointed Date | Resign Date | Date of Incorporation | Status |
1300469 | | U14200KL2011PTC028266 | HANNA ROCK PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Saturday, 30 April 2011 | | Saturday, 30 April 2011 | |
1564980 | | U55101KL2013PTC034160 | AURAL HOTELS AND RESORTS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Wednesday, 22 May 2013 | | Wednesday, 22 May 2013 | |
1725654 | | U14102KL2015PTC039042 | DURASAND GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Thursday, 20 August 2015 | | Thursday, 20 August 2015 | |
1777426 | | U14100KL2016PTC040162 | RICHSAND CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Friday, 19 February 2016 | | Friday, 19 February 2016 | |
2896202 | | U45500KL2018PTC055651 | PAUL AND HANNA BUILDERS AND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Tuesday, 27 November 2018 | | Tuesday, 27 November 2018 | |
2129899 | | U14100KL2019PTC056154 | DURABUILT CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Monday, 04 February 2019 | | Wednesday, 02 January 2019 | |
2196922 | | U14100KL2019PTC058664 | CHATTUPARA GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Tuesday, 20 August 2019 | | Thursday, 04 July 2019 | |
2322392 | | U14294KL2020PTC063344 | HIGRADE CRUSHERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Friday, 31 July 2020 | | Friday, 31 July 2020 | |
2772089 | | U14290KL2020PTC065429 | MANNATHUR GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Thursday, 29 October 2020 | | Thursday, 29 October 2020 | |
2437157 | | U45201KL2021PTC069140 | LALY BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Monday, 24 May 2021 | | Monday, 24 May 2021 | |
2491854 | | U14107KL2021PTC071406 | VAZHAPILLY GRANITES PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Thursday, 07 October 2021 | | Thursday, 07 October 2021 | |
2492099 | | U45309KL2021PTC071418 | CHITTOOR BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED | ERNAKULAM | Thursday, 07 October 2021 | | Thursday, 07 October 2021 | |
Suit Filed accounts of Rs. 25 Lacs and above Total Suit Filed : 0
# | Category | Bank / FI | Branch | Outstanding Amount In Lacs | Asset Classification | Date Of Classification | Suit |
Report Director Information Discrepancy
The information shown on this page was last updated onSunday, 22 September 2024
Due to frequent changes in Director Information, it is possible that some details you see may be out-of-date. If you feel the information is not up-to-date, you may request to get this page auto-updated now.
Request For Update If you still notice any discrepancy, please help by reporting it to us.
We appreciate your help!
Report Discrepancy